Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Christian Christensen | 02.09.2005 | 16.06.2006 | adm. dir |
Ole Kristian Dam | 07.11.2003 | 02.09.2005 | direktion |
Jens Christian Christensen | 29.10.2003 | 07.11.2003 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 15.05.2003 | 29.10.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Christian Christensen | 02.09.2005 | 16.06.2006 | bestyrelse |
Svend Erik Skovhus | 02.09.2005 | 16.06.2006 | formand |
Bent Christensen Aagaard | 06.10.2004 | 16.06.2006 | bestyrelse |
Ole Kristian Dam | 07.11.2003 | 02.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Niels de Wolff | 29.10.2003 | 06.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 15.05.2003 | 29.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lone Mai Henriksen | 15.05.2003 | 29.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Stephan Muurholm | 15.05.2003 | 29.10.2003 | formand |