Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peder Vestergaard Hellerup | 13.03.2003 | 09.01.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kjeld Jørn Pedersen | 07.04.2008 | 09.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Lilian Grinvalds Hellerup | 23.08.2005 | 09.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Peder Vestergaard Hellerup | 13.03.2003 | 09.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Lund | 13.03.2003 | 07.04.2008 | formand |
Jette Tougaard | 13.03.2003 | 23.08.2005 | bestyrelse |