Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Munck Loiborg | 19.07.2012 | 24.06.2013 | adm. dir |
Marcus Choleva | 23.06.2003 | 19.07.2012 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 06.02.2003 | 23.06.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Holm Johansen | 11.01.2013 | 24.06.2013 | næstformand |
Lisbeth Dalgaard Svanholm | 22.03.2012 | 24.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Frits Rasmussen | 19.01.2011 | 24.06.2013 | formand |
Torben Kaad Friis | 19.01.2011 | 14.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Peter Christian Hansen | 23.06.2003 | 24.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Paul Friis Nønnecke | 23.06.2003 | 22.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Simon Bent Sørensen | 23.06.2003 | 19.01.2011 | formand |
Kim Madsen | 06.02.2003 | 23.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Helle Garde Carlsen | 06.02.2003 | 23.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 06.02.2003 | 23.06.2003 | formand |