Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rami Jensen | 10.08.2018 | 26.10.2018 | adm. dir |
Michael August Bonde Christiansen | 10.10.2011 | 10.08.2018 | adm. dir |
Henrik Andersen | 29.04.2009 | 10.10.2011 | direktion |
Jens Ole Nordgaard Hansen | 20.11.2008 | 29.04.2009 | direktion |
Bo Pedersen | 19.12.2007 | 20.11.2008 | direktion |
Ole Bonde Rasmussen | 12.04.2007 | 19.12.2007 | direktion |
Pia Huusfelt | 26.05.2005 | 12.04.2007 | direktion |
Rene Michael Fleming | 17.02.2004 | 26.05.2005 | direktion |
Ole Bonde Rasmussen | 17.02.2004 | 26.05.2005 | adm. dir |
Kim Madsen | 27.03.2002 | 24.04.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jacob Brunsborg | 10.08.2018 | 26.10.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jan Bøgh | 10.08.2018 | 26.10.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Hans Henrik Kjølby | 10.08.2018 | 26.10.2018 | formand |
Mark Wodstrup Betzer | 30.06.2017 | 10.08.2018 | formand |
Piet Klein | 10.08.2015 | 10.08.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jakob Graasbøll Enemark | 03.07.2014 | 30.06.2017 | formand |
Michael August Bonde Christiansen | 10.10.2011 | 10.08.2018 | bestyrelse |
Anne-Marie Krog | 10.10.2011 | 10.08.2015 | bestyrelse |
Søren Lindgaard | 10.10.2011 | 03.07.2014 | formand |
Henrik Andersen | 20.11.2009 | 10.10.2011 | bestyrelse |
René Buchardt Hansen | 29.04.2009 | 10.10.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jens Ole Nordgaard Hansen | 20.11.2008 | 20.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mikael Thinghuus | 24.04.2008 | 01.03.2011 | formand |
Per Kampmann | 19.12.2007 | 29.04.2009 | bestyrelse |
Bo Pedersen | 19.12.2007 | 20.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Simon Stampe | 19.12.2007 | 24.04.2008 | formand |
Ole Bonde Rasmussen | 24.04.2002 | 19.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Lars Jakobsen | 24.04.2002 | 19.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
August Jes Jørgensen | 24.04.2002 | 19.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Peter Præst Christiansen | 24.04.2002 | 19.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Sten Aagesen | 24.04.2002 | 19.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 27.03.2002 | 24.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Helle Garde Carlsen | 27.03.2002 | 24.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 27.03.2002 | 24.04.2002 | formand |