Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Henning Albrechtsen | 10.03.2010 | 29.08.2011 | direktion |
Peter Jeberg | 20.05.2005 | 10.03.2010 | direktion |
Ole Rasmussen | 29.06.2001 | 20.05.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marc Christiaan van Gelder | 10.03.2010 | 29.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Gerardus Janssen | 10.03.2010 | 29.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Boysen | 10.03.2010 | 29.08.2011 | formand |
Hanne Jeberg | 20.05.2005 | 10.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Ole Rasmussen | 29.06.2001 | 10.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Peter Jeberg | 29.06.2001 | 10.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Rasmussen | 29.06.2001 | 20.05.2005 | bestyrelse |