Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Frydenriech Fogh | 06.07.2006 | 14.10.2015 | direktion |
Steen Kibsgaard | 05.05.2004 | 06.07.2006 | direktion |
Jens Ole Bahr | 07.07.2003 | 30.03.2004 | direktion |
Steen Kibsgaard | 20.06.2001 | 07.07.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Joacim Lars Bruus-Jensen | 05.05.2004 | 06.07.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jens Ole Bahr | 07.07.2003 | 30.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jan Frydenriech Fogh | 10.03.2003 | 14.10.2015 | formand |
Karsten Dan Joensen | 22.05.2002 | 10.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jan Arndt Trintved | 15.04.2002 | 07.07.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jens Erik Karlskov Jensen | 15.04.2002 | 22.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Steen Kibsgaard | 20.06.2001 | 06.07.2006 | bestyrelse |
John Holger Adamsen | 20.06.2001 | 15.04.2002 | formand |
Kim Krolmark | 20.06.2001 | 03.10.2001 | bestyrelse |