Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Mæhlskov Herlevsen | 29.11.2004 | 04.07.2005 | bestyrelse |
Finn Peder Schultz | 29.11.2004 | 04.07.2005 | formand |
Helge Wennike | 14.07.2004 | 21.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Inger Kirsten Hern | 02.04.2001 | 20.11.2007 | bestyrelse |
Trond Kjeller | 02.04.2001 | 14.07.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bulskov | 02.04.2001 | 08.10.2002 | bestyrelse |