Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tom Heinrich Vejnø | 14.09.2005 | 31.05.2006 | direktion |
Ole Buchhave Grage | 09.12.2002 | 14.09.2005 | direktion |
Søren Brock | 25.09.2001 | 25.05.2005 | adm. dir |
Brian Østergaard Mortensen | 06.02.2001 | 01.09.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Grage | 25.05.2005 | 14.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Troels Torp | 25.05.2005 | 14.09.2005 | formand |
Ole Buchhave Grage | 06.02.2001 | 14.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Erling Hvitved | 06.02.2001 | 25.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Søren Brock | 06.02.2001 | 25.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Brian Østergaard Mortensen | 06.02.2001 | 01.09.2001 | bestyrelse |