Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Melbye Frederiksen | 14.10.2009 | 01.07.2014 | direktion |
Aart Bijl | 12.11.2007 | 14.10.2009 | direktion |
Robert Jan Adriaan Hovenier | 22.01.2007 | 12.11.2007 | direktion |
Christian Falkenberg Husum | 15.06.2006 | 22.01.2007 | direktion |
Niels Melbye Frederiksen | 11.01.2005 | 15.06.2006 | adm. dir |
Sandra Moll Dirscherl | 05.01.2001 | 11.01.2005 | direktion |
Peter Flemming Alsted | 04.12.2000 | 05.01.2001 | direktion |