Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mark Wicklander | 30.09.2018 | 21.08.2019 | direktør |
Flemming Jensen | 19.12.2017 | 30.09.2018 | direktør |
Eva Merete Onsberg | 01.06.2017 | 19.12.2017 | direktør |
Flemming Jensen | 20.03.2015 | 01.06.2017 | direktør |
Mads Mose Onsberg | 01.01.2014 | 20.03.2015 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mads Mose Onsberg | 01.01.2014 | 20.03.2015 | formand |