Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Charles Bond | 19.12.2013 | 05.09.2014 | adm. dir |
Drew Alan Moyer | 12.07.2010 | 19.12.2013 | adm. dir |
Jacob Lundgreen Philipsen | 07.10.2003 | 12.07.2010 | adm. dir |
Peter Ulrik Scheel | 06.08.2003 | 07.10.2003 | adm. dir |
Matthias Müllenborn | 01.01.2002 | 06.08.2003 | adm. dir |
Peter Ulrik Scheel | 20.12.2000 | 01.01.2002 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.10.2000 | 20.12.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Charles Bond | 19.12.2013 | 05.09.2014 | formand |
John Allen Houston | 28.02.2012 | 05.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Roger Shahnazarian | 27.07.2011 | 28.02.2012 | bestyrelse |
Alan Howard Benjamin | 05.05.2008 | 05.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Drew Alan Moyer | 05.05.2008 | 19.12.2013 | formand |
Michael James McGrath | 05.05.2008 | 27.07.2011 | bestyrelse |
Edward James Prajzner | 05.05.2008 | 16.02.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jan Christensen | 16.03.2006 | 10.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lars Rønn | 18.08.2005 | 05.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lars Gade Hansen | 18.08.2005 | 14.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Matthias Müllenborn | 01.01.2002 | 06.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Mørkeberg Nielsen | 04.05.2001 | 05.05.2008 | formand |
Kent Stevens Larsen | 04.05.2001 | 24.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Peter Ulrik Scheel | 20.12.2000 | 05.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Solberg Hansen | 20.12.2000 | 04.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.10.2000 | 20.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.10.2000 | 20.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.10.2000 | 20.12.2000 | bestyrelse |