Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Toft Rasmussen | 01.09.2000 | 08.01.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Toft Rasmussen | 01.09.2000 | 24.07.2003 | bestyrelse |
Morten Søndberg | 01.09.2000 | 24.07.2003 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Oscar Hornsleth | 01.09.2000 | 21.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
David Hald | 01.09.2000 | 22.01.2001 | bestyrelse |
Peter Rodenberg Nielsen | 01.09.2000 | 22.01.2001 | bestyrelse |