Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Montadar Taha Reda | 01.01.2016 | 23.08.2017 | direktør |
Montadar Taha Reda | 27.10.2015 | 09.12.2015 | suppleant |
Mansura Mhammad Abdulhussain | 02.06.2014 | 01.01.2016 | direktion |
Rafal Jasem Nesaif Jasem Al-Zubaidi | 25.04.2014 | 02.06.2014 | direktion |
Mansura M. AbdulHussaien | 15.12.2013 | 25.04.2014 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Montadar Taha Reda | 27.10.2015 | 09.12.2015 | suppleant |
Mansura M. AbdulHussaien | 15.12.2013 | 25.04.2014 | bestyrelse |