Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Albin Nilsson | 11.10.2000 | 13.11.2012 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 20.05.2000 | 11.10.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Tauby Sørensen | 11.10.2000 | 13.11.2012 | bestyrelse |
Bent Albin Nilsson | 11.10.2000 | 13.11.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jens Wichmand Jørgensen | 11.10.2000 | 30.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 20.05.2000 | 11.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 20.05.2000 | 11.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 20.05.2000 | 11.10.2000 | formand |