Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Højgaard | 18.08.2005 | 20.02.2008 | direktion |
Mogens Marcus Mentz | 20.02.2002 | 15.03.2010 | direktion |
Eivind Sundstein | 12.05.2000 | 07.11.2005 | direktion |
Kim Plaschke | 12.05.2000 | 16.04.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Michael Berger | 03.08.2009 | 08.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Henriette Pedersen | 20.02.2008 | 15.03.2010 | formand |
Katja Henriette Gaarde Carstensen | 20.02.2008 | 03.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Marcus Mentz | 07.06.2007 | 15.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jan Renneberg | 07.11.2005 | 31.01.2008 | formand |
Eivind Sundstein | 07.11.2005 | 02.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jógvan Sundstein | 18.08.2005 | 07.11.2005 | formand |
Niels Højgaard | 21.06.2005 | 20.02.2008 | bestyrelse |