Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Søren Enggaard | 22.12.1999 | 04.10.2019 | direktion |
Henrik Calum | 26.11.1999 | 22.12.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Enggaard | 19.12.2011 | 04.10.2019 | bestyrelse |
Søren Enggaard | 19.12.2011 | 04.10.2019 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Enggaard | 19.12.2011 | 04.10.2019 | bestyrelse |
Inger Mulvad Enggaard | 19.12.2011 | 04.10.2019 | formand |