Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Jakobsson | 06.10.1976 | 30.09.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gert Jørn Kjeldsen | 06.10.1976 | 30.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ole Jakobsson | 06.10.1976 | 30.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Egil Christensen | 06.10.1976 | 30.09.1995 | formand |
Ib Martin Nørgaard | 06.10.1976 | 12.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Christian Johansen | 06.10.1976 | 22.06.1992 | formand |
Per Munkholm Bertelsen | 06.10.1976 | 06.02.1989 | formand |