Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Laumark-Møller | 11.05.1995 | 12.09.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Erik Andersen | 24.05.2004 | 12.09.2005 | formand |
Lene Jacobsgaard | 27.04.2001 | 12.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Ole Tandrup | 27.04.2001 | 24.05.2004 | formand |
Flemming Laumark-Møller | 09.04.1999 | 12.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jens Peter Rønde Lenith | 09.04.1999 | 29.08.2000 | bestyrelse |