Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Conrad Halling Olesen | 01.03.2002 | 11.02.2009 | adm. dir |
Thorkild Aksel Jensen | 22.06.1999 | 30.11.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Conrad Halling Olesen | 22.06.1999 | 11.02.2009 | bestyrelse |
Anna Krog Hansen | 22.06.1999 | 30.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Karen Marie Majkær Pedersen | 22.06.1999 | 30.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Lis Bebe Nielsen | 22.06.1999 | 30.11.2005 | bestyrelse |