Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Kipp | 29.04.1999 | 08.10.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Skov Glud | 01.07.2008 | 01.02.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Schou | 15.04.2004 | 01.07.2008 | bestyrelse |
Henning Kipp | 29.04.1999 | 08.10.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jette Skov Kipp | 29.04.1999 | 01.02.2009 | bestyrelse |
Gudrun Laursen | 29.04.1999 | 26.06.2006 | bestyrelse |