Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anette Uttenthal | 24.05.2005 | 11.08.2009 | direktion |
Mogens Brask | 07.05.1999 | 24.05.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Pia Jeanette Lorenzen | 14.01.2008 | 11.08.2009 | formand |
Jan Mogens Uttenthal | 24.05.2005 | 11.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Anette Uttenthal | 07.05.1999 | 11.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Ulrik Heine | 07.05.1999 | 14.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Brask | 07.05.1999 | 24.05.2005 | bestyrelse |