Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Knutzon | 01.10.1997 | 30.06.1998 | direktion |
Inger Margrethe Bekker | 30.11.1995 | 29.03.2001 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.03.1992 | 15.12.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Hansen | 01.10.1997 | 29.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Michael Louis Bekker | 01.10.1997 | 29.03.2001 | formand |
Peter Jan Roust | 01.10.1997 | 30.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Inger Margrethe Bekker | 30.11.1995 | 29.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jens Ove Henneberg | 30.11.1995 | 01.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Steen Bjerregaard | 30.11.1995 | 01.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Anker Borch Kaalund | 30.11.1995 | 07.04.1997 | formand |
Paul Lund | 01.03.1992 | 27.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Eskild Lyngholm | 01.03.1992 | 27.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Inger Margrethe Bekker | 01.03.1992 | 27.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1992 | 15.12.1992 | bestyrelse |