Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Gimsing | 27.11.2013 | 30.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jens Peter Toft | 14.11.2012 | 30.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Søgaard | 01.04.2007 | 30.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Erik Ejvind Pedersen | 23.06.2006 | 27.11.2013 | bestyrelse |
Sven Jørgen Frost | 04.06.2002 | 14.11.2012 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Christrup | 01.04.2000 | 31.03.2007 | formand |
Helge Evald Tharø | 09.12.1985 | 04.06.2006 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Laursen | 09.12.1985 | 04.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Gorrissen | 09.12.1985 | 31.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Sven Hansen | 09.12.1985 | 28.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Esben Svane Ingemann | 09.12.1985 | 11.10.1988 | bestyrelse |