Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leon Kildbane | 23.11.1998 | 30.07.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Dall | 26.05.1999 | 03.04.2000 | bestyrelse |
Leon Kildbane | 23.11.1998 | 30.07.2002 | bestyrelse |
Gitte Kildbane | 23.11.1998 | 30.07.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jette Møller | 23.11.1998 | 30.07.2002 | bestyrelse |