Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torsten Rich | 01.04.2005 | 31.03.2005 | adm. dir |
Jørgen Jørgensen | 10.03.2005 | 11.01.2010 | adm. dir |
Jens Arne Dahl Jensen | 28.01.1998 | 01.04.2004 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.09.1997 | 28.01.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Hein | 05.03.2007 | 11.01.2010 | formand |
Torsten Rich | 01.04.2005 | 11.01.2010 | bestyrelse |
Per Møller | 28.01.1998 | 11.01.2010 | bestyrelse |
Leo Larsen Alting | 28.01.1998 | 05.03.2007 | formand |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1997 | 28.01.1998 | bestyrelse |