Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Christian Hansen | 30.07.1998 | 14.01.1999 | direktion |
Allan Stoklund Lydersen | 09.06.1997 | 30.07.1998 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.12.1996 | 09.06.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Christian Hansen | 09.06.1997 | 28.09.2001 | bestyrelse |
John Magne Hestnes | 09.06.1997 | 28.09.2001 | bestyrelse |
Steinar Ingemann Mauritz | 09.06.1997 | 28.09.2001 | bestyrelse |
Allan Stoklund Lydersen | 09.06.1997 | 30.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 15.12.1996 | 09.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.12.1996 | 09.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 15.12.1996 | 09.06.1997 | formand |