Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Christian Simonsen | 07.04.1998 | 01.06.2010 | direktion |
John Bent Poulsen | 06.02.1997 | 07.04.1998 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.10.1996 | 06.02.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Irene Wedel Simonsen | 07.04.1998 | 01.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Simonsen | 06.02.1997 | 01.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Poul Møller | 06.02.1997 | 15.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
John Bent Poulsen | 06.02.1997 | 07.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.10.1996 | 06.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Lone Mai Henriksen | 01.10.1996 | 06.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gaardboe Bertelsen | 01.10.1996 | 06.02.1997 | formand |