Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Henrik Hauge | 04.10.2001 | 26.01.2009 | direktion |
Klaus Jensen | 15.01.1999 | 04.10.2001 | direktion |
Frank Andersen | 01.06.1998 | 15.01.1999 | direktion |
Poul Henrik Hauge | 01.06.1998 | 01.06.1998 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Henrik Hauge | 04.10.2001 | 19.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Dorte Hedegaard | 04.10.2001 | 19.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Lars Henrik Bjerg | 04.10.2001 | 19.04.2005 | formand |
Klaus Jensen | 15.01.1999 | 30.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Frank Andersen | 01.06.1998 | 25.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Lotte Hansen | 01.06.1998 | 25.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jan Ammitzbøll Sørensen | 16.11.1995 | 01.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jurij Rostrup Harboe | 16.11.1995 | 01.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kim Kristensen | 16.11.1995 | 01.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Lars Henrik Bjerg | 16.11.1995 | 01.06.1998 | formand |