Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Gross-Nielsen | 13.03.2002 | 07.07.2003 | direktion |
Søren Christiansen | 20.04.1999 | 13.03.2002 | direktør |
Allan Gross-Nielsen | 14.06.1995 | 20.04.1999 | direktion |
Søren Christiansen | 14.06.1995 | 15.04.1998 | direktion |
Allan Gross-Nielsen | 14.06.1995 | 10.04.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Blenstrup Nielsen | 10.04.1997 | 07.07.2003 | formand |
Allan Gross-Nielsen | 14.06.1995 | 07.07.2003 | bestyrelse |
Søren Christiansen | 14.06.1995 | 07.07.2003 | bestyrelse |
Alan Per Binau | 14.06.1995 | 30.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Flordeliza Rosario Christiansen | 14.06.1995 | 10.04.1997 | bestyrelse |
Vibeke Gross-Nielsen | 14.06.1995 | 10.04.1997 | bestyrelse |