Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Ølbye | 15.02.1998 | 28.02.2001 | adm. dir |
Peter Ølbye | 01.07.1995 | 28.02.2001 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.1995 | 22.01.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bendt Ølbye | 18.07.1998 | 28.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Petra Ølbye | 12.05.1998 | 28.02.2001 | formand |
Finn Ølbye | 15.02.1998 | 28.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Aase Ølbye | 01.07.1995 | 16.03.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peter Ølbye | 01.07.1995 | 15.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.1995 | 22.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.07.1995 | 22.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.07.1995 | 22.01.1996 | bestyrelse |