Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sten Andersen | 25.09.2002 | 03.09.2021 | adm. dir |
Lisbeth Rahbek Utoft | 01.05.1995 | 25.09.2002 | direktion |
Sten Andersen | 01.05.1995 | 03.11.1995 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.05.1995 | 05.10.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1995 | 05.10.1995 | bestyrelse |