Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Ingolf Nissen | 01.03.1995 | 03.04.1996 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.03.1995 | 05.05.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helle Iversen | 25.08.1995 | 03.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Svend Krogh | 01.03.1995 | 03.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Vilhelm Hald-Christensen | 01.03.1995 | 03.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Lindum Møller | 01.03.1995 | 25.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.03.1995 | 05.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Lone Mai Henriksen | 01.03.1995 | 05.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gaardboe Bertelsen | 01.03.1995 | 05.05.1995 | formand |