Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Fritz Larsen | 06.12.2006 | 09.03.2012 | direktion |
Katja Gindrup | 06.12.2006 | 09.03.2012 | direktion |
Johnny J. Ho | 06.12.2006 | 09.03.2012 | direktion |
Gen-Shen Chen | 04.04.2002 | 09.03.2012 | direktion |
Gen-Shen Chen | 30.11.1999 | 30.11.1999 | direktion |
Allan Munk Nielsen | 15.04.1998 | 09.03.2012 | direktion |
Fritz Larsen | 15.04.1998 | 15.03.2002 | direktion |
Katja Gindrup | 15.04.1998 | 15.03.2002 | direktion |
John Stig Hansen | 23.06.1997 | 15.04.1998 | direktion |
Birger Ove Andersen | 27.12.1995 | 15.04.1998 | direktion |
Bjarne Petersen | 27.12.1995 | 15.04.1998 | direktion |
Ole Bent Larsen | 20.11.1995 | 23.06.1997 | direktion |
John Stig Hansen | 01.04.1993 | 20.11.1995 | direktion |
Birger Ove Andersen | 01.04.1993 | 20.11.1995 | direktion |
Bjarne Petersen | 01.04.1993 | 20.11.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1993 | 27.12.1993 | direktion |