Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ansgar Mathiassen | 10.12.1992 | 26.03.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Caroline Mathiassen | 26.11.2006 | 26.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Nanna Stigsdatter Mathiassen | 26.11.2006 | 26.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Anne Mathiassen | 21.12.1995 | 26.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Ansgar Mathiassen | 10.12.1992 | 26.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Mathiassen | 10.12.1992 | 26.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Per Hvass | 10.12.1992 | 21.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Hedvig Hvass | 10.12.1992 | 21.12.1995 | bestyrelse |