Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Villads Vilfred Bojsen Vind | 14.03.2007 | 28.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Fritz Larsen | 12.04.2005 | 28.11.2011 | formand |
Allan Munk Nielsen | 12.04.2005 | 12.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Henning Petersen | 10.12.1992 | 28.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Preben Clemmensen Uldall | 10.12.1992 | 14.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Ole Bent Larsen | 10.12.1992 | 23.06.1997 | formand |