Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vibeke Thinggaard Aagaard | 06.12.2007 | 06.12.2013 | adm. dir |
Vibeke Thinggaard | 06.12.2007 | 06.12.2007 | adm. dir |
Peter Melchior | 01.09.2006 | 06.12.2007 | adm. dir |
Henrik Bernhardt | 08.12.2000 | 31.08.2006 | adm. dir |
Allan Christensen | 08.12.2000 | 28.09.2001 | direktion |
Erik Svinth Andersen | 15.06.1992 | 19.09.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Annegrete Birck Jakobsen | 27.04.2012 | 06.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Michael Nellemann Pedersen | 27.04.2012 | 06.12.2013 | næstformand |
Peter Melchior | 30.04.2008 | 27.04.2012 | næstformand |
Annegrete Birck Jakobsen | 04.09.2006 | 30.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Peter Melchior | 17.01.2005 | 04.09.2006 | næstformand |
Peter Damgaard Jensen | 03.12.2001 | 06.12.2013 | formand |
Jens Kjærsgaard | 22.05.2001 | 17.01.2005 | næstformand |
Bent Nyløkke | 22.05.2001 | 03.12.2001 | formand |
Troels Christian Gunnergaard | 12.11.1999 | 03.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Rolf Norstrand | 04.05.1999 | 29.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bernhardt | 15.06.1992 | 22.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Ali Richter Nielsen | 15.06.1992 | 18.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Sonja Vera Albrink | 15.06.1992 | 12.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans Peter Baadsgaard | 15.06.1992 | 29.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Svend Emil Nielsen | 15.06.1992 | 06.10.1993 | bestyrelse |
Anne Flindt Christiansen | 15.06.1992 | 06.10.1993 | bestyrelse |