Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Pedersen | 04.04.1992 | 23.08.2023 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Line Herbst | 01.04.2016 | 23.08.2023 | formand |
Charlotte Høegh | 30.08.2012 | 01.04.2016 | formand |
Jan Torp Hansen | 21.10.2008 | 30.08.2012 | formand |
Mikael Werner Thomsen | 04.04.2003 | 27.02.2004 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Torsten Pedersen | 25.04.2002 | 21.10.2008 | formand |
Peter Scharling | 25.04.2002 | 27.02.2004 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Michael Pedersen | 04.04.1992 | 23.08.2023 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Ann Ravn Pedersen | 04.04.1992 | 23.08.2023 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Thorsten Dahl | 04.04.1992 | 25.04.2002 | bestyrelsesmedlem |