Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Gregers Daugaard-Jensen | 06.03.1992 | 25.10.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Jacob Roldsgaard | 28.09.2001 | 06.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Karin Høgh | 06.10.1998 | 14.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
John Gregers Daugaard-Jensen | 06.03.1992 | 17.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Sven Horsten | 06.03.1992 | 12.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Irene Daugaard-Jensen | 06.03.1992 | 06.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Allan Berg Jessen Bryld | 06.03.1992 | 05.05.1992 | bestyrelse |