Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Leo Holstein | 31.03.1992 | 25.04.1996 | direktion |
Michael Holberg Engstrøm | 12.12.1991 | 31.03.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karina Moll Ravn | 22.11.1993 | 25.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Nordahl Møller | 08.12.1992 | 22.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jan Rode | 06.10.1992 | 11.05.1994 | bestyrelse |
Michael Leo Holstein | 12.12.1991 | 25.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jan Passer Lange | 12.12.1991 | 25.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Casper Münter | 12.12.1991 | 08.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Michael Holberg Engstrøm | 12.12.1991 | 06.10.1992 | bestyrelse |