Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hilmar Bak | 01.06.1999 | 30.12.2002 | direktion |
Palle Nielsen | 01.02.1992 | 30.12.2002 | direktion |
Pia Gylling Petersen | 01.02.1992 | 30.12.2002 | direktion |
Hilmar Bak | 01.02.1992 | 01.08.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1992 | 21.01.1993 | direktion |