Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Birger Terkildsen | 31.08.2001 | 08.05.2003 | direktion |
Peter Birger Terkildsen | 01.10.1996 | 05.09.2001 | direktion |
Peter Axel Dam | 06.09.1991 | 30.09.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Skov | 07.03.1997 | 08.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Peter Birger Terkildsen | 07.03.1997 | 08.05.2003 | formand |
Niels Birger Terkildsen | 06.09.1991 | 08.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Peter Axel Dam | 06.09.1991 | 07.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Erik Preben Hansen | 06.09.1991 | 07.03.1997 | bestyrelse |