Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Kristiansen | 23.02.2000 | 16.06.2005 | direktion |
Gert Andersen | 01.08.1997 | 10.02.2000 | direktion |
Finn Jørn Overby Mikkelsen | 12.04.1995 | 01.08.1997 | direktion |
Kurt Kristiansen | 01.07.1991 | 12.04.1995 | direktion |
Niels Poul Iversen | 01.07.1991 | 30.11.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 07.01.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johannes Peter Olsen | 01.02.2001 | 27.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Inge Kristiansen | 29.06.2000 | 01.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Per Kristian Kristiansen | 23.02.2000 | 01.06.2002 | formand |
Gunner Termansen | 28.06.1999 | 27.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Erik Valder Jensen | 28.06.1999 | 01.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Gert Andersen | 17.06.1999 | 10.02.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Kristiansen | 01.07.1991 | 16.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
John Papuga | 01.07.1991 | 17.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Elmer Strandgaard | 01.07.1991 | 17.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Niels Poul Iversen | 01.07.1991 | 30.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bent Aage Christensen | 01.07.1991 | 30.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Mads Georg Jensen | 01.07.1991 | 30.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.07.1991 | 07.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 07.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 07.01.1992 | formand |