Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Else Torbjørg Kappel | 01.05.1991 | 03.01.2001 | direktion |
Sven Tore Kappel | 01.05.1991 | 12.10.1992 | direktion |
Hans Peter Korsgaard | 01.05.1991 | 12.10.1992 | direktion |
Niels Just Poulsen | 01.05.1991 | 10.12.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1991 | 18.10.1991 | direktion |