Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagn Aage Rask | 01.01.1991 | 02.03.1998 | direktion |
Steen Schierbeck | 01.01.1991 | 15.08.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Christiansen | 01.01.1991 | 02.07.1997 | bestyrelse |
Keld Anker | 01.01.1991 | 02.07.1997 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Aage Rask | 01.01.1991 | 02.07.1997 | bestyrelse |
Rita Birgit Rask | 01.01.1991 | 02.07.1997 | bestyrelse |