Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Caroline Veronique Valadie | 15.04.1990 | 09.08.1993 | direktion |
Karina Agnete Soya | 15.04.1990 | 18.04.1991 | direktion |
Aldo Balzano | 15.04.1990 | 14.01.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Paul Rolf Meurs-Gerken | 15.04.1990 | 09.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Aldo Balzano | 15.04.1990 | 09.08.1993 | bestyrelse |