Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Christiansen | 01.05.1998 | 20.07.1998 | adm. dir |
Per Arne Gustav Rosenqvist | 01.06.1996 | 01.05.1998 | adm. dir |
Gregers Kofoed-Hansen | 02.05.1994 | 01.06.1996 | adm. dir |
Pauli Anton Rosenbeck | 01.01.1990 | 02.05.1994 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1990 | 26.11.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Christiansen | 05.02.1998 | 20.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lyhne Hansen | 05.02.1998 | 20.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Svend Aage Koch-Christensen | 05.02.1998 | 20.07.1998 | formand |
Peter Carlsson | 01.01.1990 | 05.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peter Grønbjerg Andersen | 01.01.1990 | 19.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Henning Orla Jensen | 01.01.1990 | 01.11.1994 | formand |
Kaare Vagner Jensen | 01.01.1990 | 29.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Svend Erik Bruun | 01.01.1990 | 24.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.01.1990 | 26.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1990 | 26.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.01.1990 | 26.11.1990 | formand |