Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Heinz Nicolai Petersen | 01.01.1990 | 31.05.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Petersen | 12.11.1996 | 31.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Heinz Nicolai Petersen | 01.01.1990 | 31.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jens Bertel Rasmussen | 01.01.1990 | 31.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Carl Sørensen | 01.01.1990 | 12.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Møller Larsen | 01.01.1990 | 16.05.1991 | bestyrelse |