Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hermann Uffe Thomsen Kristensen | 01.01.1990 | 27.03.2007 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1990 | 22.06.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bitten Marie Sørensen | 10.06.1997 | 30.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Hermann Uffe Thomsen Kristensen | 10.06.1997 | 30.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Knud Graversen | 10.06.1997 | 30.11.1999 | formand |