Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gert Nordingsgaard | 06.06.2007 | 09.06.2008 | direktion |
Jørgen Søndergaard Pedersen | 01.11.1989 | 06.06.2007 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 29.03.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gert Nordingsgaard | 06.06.2007 | 09.06.2008 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Bonfils | 06.06.2007 | 09.06.2008 | formand |
Hans Christian Esbensen | 06.06.2007 | 09.06.2008 | næstformand |
Gert Ejvin Petersen | 01.11.1989 | 06.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Kristen Vangsø Laursen | 01.11.1989 | 06.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Søndergaard Pedersen | 01.11.1989 | 06.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1989 | 29.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 29.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 29.03.1990 | formand |