Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Munk Nielsen | 15.04.1998 | 03.03.2003 | direktion |
John Stig Hansen | 23.06.1997 | 15.04.1998 | direktion |
Ole Bent Larsen | 20.11.1995 | 23.06.1997 | direktion |
John Stig Hansen | 01.07.1989 | 20.11.1995 | direktion |
Dan Rybak | 01.07.1989 | 10.01.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Munk Nielsen | 15.04.1998 | 03.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Katja Gindrup | 15.04.1998 | 03.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Fritz Larsen | 15.04.1998 | 03.03.2003 | formand |
John Stig Hansen | 01.07.1989 | 15.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Birger Ove Andersen | 01.07.1989 | 15.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Petersen | 01.07.1989 | 15.04.1998 | formand |
Gunnar Hans Johan Hansen | 01.07.1989 | 14.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Dan Rybak | 01.07.1989 | 10.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Annalise Stege | 01.07.1989 | 10.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Lise-Lotte Lyng Andersen | 01.07.1989 | 10.01.1990 | formand |